Research Center for Entrepreneurship Evidence
Organisational unit: Institute
- Academic networks or partnerships
Pan European Entrepreneurship Researchers Peer (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Executive member)
2012 → …Activity: Membership › Academic networks or partnerships › Research
- Learned societies and special interest organisations
Centrum für Existenzgründung in Theorie & Anwendung e.V. (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.01.2003 → …Activity: Membership › Learned societies and special interest organisations › Research
European Council for Small Business and Entrepreneurship (ECSB) (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.11.2011 → 30.10.2014Activity: Membership › Learned societies and special interest organisations › Research
European Council for Small Business and Entrepreneurship (ECSB) (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.11.2006 → …Activity: Membership › Learned societies and special interest organisations › Research
German Academic Association for Business Research e.V. (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.01.2009 → …Activity: Membership › Learned societies and special interest organisations › Research
International Council for Small Business (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.11.2006 → …Activity: Membership › Learned societies and special interest organisations › Research
Pan European Entrepreneurship Researchers Peer (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.07.2011 → …Activity: Membership › Learned societies and special interest organisations › Research
Verein für Socialpolitik e.V. (External organisation)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.01.2009 → …Activity: Membership › Learned societies and special interest organisations › Research
- Leuphana academic councils and committees
Graduate School (Organisational unit)
Markus Reihlen (Office)
10.2010 → 04.2012Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
Leuphana Universität Lüneburg (Organisational unit)
Silke Tegtmeier (Member)
01.06.2009 → 01.05.2014Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees