Professorship for Economics, in Particular Economic Policy
Organisational unit: Section
Wirtschafts- und Sozialwissenschaftlicher Fakultätentag (Event)
Thomas Wein (Executive member)
22.06.2023 → 23.06.2023Activity: Membership › Academic networks or partnerships › Transfer
Wer gegen wen: Intramodaler, intermodaler und potenzieller Wettbewerb im Schienenfernverkehr
Thomas Wein (Speaker)
31.01.2008Activity: Talk or presentation › Guest lectures › Research
Volkswirtschaftliches Forschungskolloquium in Lüneburg - 2011
Toufic M. El Masri (Speaker)
2011Activity: Participating in or organising an academic or articstic event › External workshops, courses, seminars › Research
Volkswirtschaftliches Forschungskolloquium in Lüneburg - 2011
Toufic M. El Masri (Speaker)
2010Activity: Participating in or organising an academic or articstic event › Conferences › Research
The Geneva Risk and Insurance Review (Journal)
Thomas Wein (Reviewer)
30.06.2010 → 30.12.2100Activity: Publication peer-review and editorial work › Peer review of publicationen › Research
Summer School in Law and Economics - 2009
Annika Pape (Participant)
02.06.2009 → 06.06.2009Activity: Participating in or organising an academic or articstic event › External workshops, courses, seminars › Research
School of Public Affairs (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Chair)
01.04.2022 → 30.09.2024Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Public Affairs (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Chair)
01.04.2022 → 30.09.2024Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Public Affairs (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Chair)
01.04.2017 → 30.09.2024Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Coordinator)
2008 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Member)
2003 → 2005Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Deputy member)
01.10.2010 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Annika Pape (Member)
05.2009 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Annika Pape (Member)
10.08.2009 → 29.01.2010Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Annika Pape (Member)
28.06.2010 → 18.12.2010Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Office)
01.04.2016 → 31.12.2016Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
Peter Lang (Publisher)
Annika Pape (Editor)
2011 → …Activity: Publication peer-review and editorial work › Editor of unfinished anthology/collection › Research
Leuphana Universität Lüneburg (Organisational unit)
Annika Pape (Deputy member)
2010 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
Leuphana Universität Lüneburg (Organisational unit)
Annika Pape (Coordinator)
01.02.2009 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
Graduate School (Organisational unit)
Thomas Wein (Member)
01.01.2018 → 31.12.2018Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees