Institute of Information Systems
Organisational unit: Institute
- Professorship for Computer Engineering
- Professorship for Information Systems, in particular Artificial Intelligence and Explainability
- Professorship for Information Systems, in particular Data Science
- Professorship for Information Systems, in particular Digital Transformation and Information Management
- Professorship for Information Systems, in particular E-Business and Knowledge Management
- Professorship for Information Systems, in particular Machine Learning
- Professorship for Information Systems, in particular Network Science
Senat (Organisational unit)
Burkhardt Funk (Member)
2020 → 2022Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Peter Niemeyer (Full member)
01.04.2006 → 30.03.2008Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Peter Niemeyer (Office)
01.10.2010 → 31.03.2016Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Peter Niemeyer (Full member)
01.04.2008 → 30.09.2010Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Reinhard Schulte (Full member)
01.10.2009 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Norbert Sturm (Deputy member)
01.10.2010 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Paul Drews (Office)
01.04.2015 → 31.03.2018Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Paul Drews (Member)
11.02.2015 → 31.03.2016Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Paul Drews (Office)
01.04.2016 → 31.03.2018Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees
School of Management and Technology (Organisational unit)
Paul Drews (Member)
01.10.2015 → …Activity: Membership › Leuphana academic councils and committees › Leuphana Academic Committees